This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 11:56:25 (UTC).

PAMELA HILL VS THE ART OF TEA, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 PAMELA HILL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE ART OF TEA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6490

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL PAMELA

Defendant

THE ART OF TEA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUZARI AZAR

Defendant Attorney

NEUFELD TIMOTHY LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/1/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/23/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE ART OF TEA, LLC'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/14/2020: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE ART OF TEA, LLC'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Request - REQUEST DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY MEDIATION

8/14/2020: Request - REQUEST DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY MEDIATION

Case Management Statement

8/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

1/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketRequest (Defendant's Request for Stay of Proceedings and Early Mediation); Filed by The Art of Tea, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Defendant The Art Of Tea, LLC's Answer To Unverified Complaint); Filed by The Art of Tea, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pamela Hill (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEUFELD TIMOTHY L.