Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 05:14:04 (UTC).

PAMELA ADELE KERSEY VS 319 14ST LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 PAMELA ADELE KERSEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 319 14ST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1908

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERSEY PAMELA ADELE

Defendants

MIDFIRST BANK

319 14ST LLC

1ST CENTURY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAVANAGH NATALYA Y.

Defendant Attorney

WIDENER VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/24/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

2/22/2021: Answer

Answer

1/27/2021: Answer

Answer

1/27/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • Hearing07/09/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Case Management Conference); Filed by MIDFIRST BANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by PAMELA ADELE KERSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 319 14TH LLC Erroneously Sued As 319 14ST LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 319 14TH LLC Erroneously Sued As 319 14ST LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MIDFIRST BANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PAMELA ADELE KERSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PAMELA ADELE KERSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PAMELA ADELE KERSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PAMELA ADELE KERSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PAMELA ADELE KERSEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1ST CENTURY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAVANAGH NATALYA Y.