This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 04:56:36 (UTC).

PAMALA BROOKWELL VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 PAMALA BROOKWELL filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1675

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROOKWELL PAMALA

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION OF THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CUNNINGHAM JAMES JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

HOUSE CALVIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RESPONDENTS DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

9/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RESPONDENTS DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

8/30/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/14/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION'S NOTICE OF NO BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN OUTCOME

6/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE RESPONDENT LOS ANGELES COUNTY CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION'S NOTICE OF NO BENEFICIAL INTEREST IN OUTCOME

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Request for Judicial Notice

7/1/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/1/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

5/25/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition for Writ of Mandate

5/24/2021: Petition for Writ of Mandate

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 85 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF RESPONDENTS DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Sheriff's Department (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Sheriff's Department (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial Setting conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Respondent's Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus); Filed by Pamala Brookwell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Sheriff's Department (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); County of Los Angeles Sheriff's Department (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Pamala Brookwell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Respondent Los Angeles County Civil Service Commission's Notice Of No Beneficial Interest In Outcome); Filed by Civil Service Commission of the County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Pamala Brookwell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pamala Brookwell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Pamala Brookwell (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUNNINGHAM JAMES JOSEPH