This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 04:48:21 (UTC).

PAM FAIRE ET AL VS JOEL HENRIOD D D S ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 PAM FAIRE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOEL HENRIOD D D S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4737

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FAIRE KEN

FAIRE PAM

Defendants and Respondents

MILLER RONDALD W. D.D.S.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

HENRIOD JOEL D.D.S.

PASADENA PERIODONTICS

MILLER & HENRIOD DENTAL PARTNERSHIP

MHS

PERIODONTICS PASADENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GOLDBERG ROBERT D. ESQ.

BUNCH BRUCE MONROE

Defendant Attorney

PETERSON GEORGE E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Joel, D.D.S. Henriod (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an Order To Continue Trial and all Discovery Cut-Off Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order To Continue Tria...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (For an Order To Continue Trial and all Discovery Cut-Off Dates); Filed by Joel, D.D.S. Henriod (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by Pam Faire (Plaintiff); Ken Faire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (-FSC:5-30-19 Trial 6-12-19); Filed by Pam Faire (Plaintiff); Ken Faire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Pam Faire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Pam Faire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Pam Faire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Pam Faire (Plaintiff); Ken Faire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT OF PAM FAIRE AND KEN FAIRE FOR NEGLIGENCE AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC664737    Hearing Date: February 18, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

pam faire, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

joel henriod, d.d.s., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC664737

Hearing Date: February 18, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

defendantS’ Motion to compel compliance with subpoena

Defendant Joel Henriod, D.D.S. and Miller & Henriod Dental Partnership (“Defendants”) move to compel third party Savannah Sanfield, LMFT (“Deponent”) to comply with a subpoena for the production of records about Plaintiff Pam Faire (“Plaintiff”). Code of Civil Procedure § 1987.1 provides, “[i]f a subpoena requires the attendance of a witness or the production of books, documents, electronically stored information, or other things before a court, or at the trial of an issue therein, or at the taking of a deposition, the court, upon motion . . . may make an order quashing the subpoena entirely, modifying it, or directing compliance with it upon those terms or conditions as the court shall declare, including protective orders.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1987.1.)

Defendants personally served Deponent with a subpoena for the production of records about Plaintiff. Personal service of the subpoena compels Deponent to produce the records. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 2020.220, subds. (b)-(c).) However, Defendants have not demonstrated that they personally served the motion on Deponent, or that Deponent has agreed to accept service by mail, as required by California Rules of Court, rule 3.1346. The proof of service states that the motion was served by mail on January 17, 2020. Therefore, the motion is denied without prejudice. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 18, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court