This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 06:03:13 (UTC).

PALOS VERDES BAY CLUB, INC. VS CONSTRUCTION SERVICE GROUP, INC. DBA HUNT BROS ROOFING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PALOS VERDES BAY CLUB, INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CONSTRUCTION SERVICE GROUP, INC DBA HUNT BROS ROOFING,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0051

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALOS VERDES BAY CLUB INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

NATIONAL ROOFING CONSULTANTS INC.

HUNT BRADLEY

CONSTRUCTION SERVICE GROUP INC. DBA HUNT BROS ROOFING

ANTIS ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING LLC

JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CONSTRUCTION SERVICE GROUP INC. DBA HUNT BROS ROOFING

ANTIS ROOFING AND WATERPROOFING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOSS BRYAN

Defendant Attorneys

RICKS DAVID

STEFFY JUDITH JOANNE

TOLSON CATHARINE MICHELLE

NOORY HAMED

WOLKIN BRANDT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/8/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 08/30/2022

8/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 08/30/2022

Order - Dismissal

8/30/2022: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

8/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ANY MEDIATI...)

6/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ANY MEDIATI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; FAI...)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; FAI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/07/2022

2/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/07/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/31/2022: Case Management Statement

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Palos Verdes Bay Club, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default: Filed By: Palos Verdes Bay Club, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 03/17/2021; As To Parties changed from National Roofing Consultants, Inc. (Defendant), Construction Service Group, Inc. dba Hunt Bros Roofing (Defendant), Bradley Hunt (Defendant) to National Roofing Consultants, Inc. (Defendant), Construction Service Group, Inc. dba Hunt Bros Roofing (Defendant), Bradley Hunt (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Palos Verdes Bay Club, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Construction Service Group, Inc. dba Hunt Bros Roofing (Defendant); Bradley Hunt (Defendant); National Roofing Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Palos Verdes Bay Club, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Construction Service Group, Inc. dba Hunt Bros Roofing (Defendant); Bradley Hunt (Defendant); National Roofing Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Palos Verdes Bay Club, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Construction Service Group, Inc. dba Hunt Bros Roofing (Defendant); Bradley Hunt (Defendant); National Roofing Consultants, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less