This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 09:51:54 (UTC).

PALACIOS, ROCIO VS PALACIOS, OSBALDO

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 PALACIOS, ROCIO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PALACIOS, OSBALDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is POWELL, MICHAEL R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8999

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

POWELL, MICHAEL R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PALACIOS ROCIO

Respondent

PALACIOS OSBALDO

Other

LARA RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

LARA RICHARD LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Air Conditioning & Refridgeration Industry Trust Fund

9/8/2021: Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Air Conditioning & Refridgeration Industry Trust Fund

Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Air Conditioning & Refridgeration Industry Trust Fund

9/8/2021: Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - Air Conditioning & Refridgeration Industry Trust Fund

Writ - Execution - REJECTED

7/23/2021: Writ - Execution - REJECTED

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

7/23/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service - electronic service re: RFO with attachments, Income and Expense Declaration & Court Order for FCCR Conference

7/23/2021: Proof of Service - electronic service re: RFO with attachments, Income and Expense Declaration & Court Order for FCCR Conference

Opposition - AMENDED To Petitioner's Objection and Motion To strike The Respondent's Untilely Responsive Pleading Pursuant to CCP Section 1005

4/26/2021: Opposition - AMENDED To Petitioner's Objection and Motion To strike The Respondent's Untilely Responsive Pleading Pursuant to CCP Section 1005

Minute Order

4/27/2021: Minute Order

Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

5/13/2021: Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

Order - Earnings Asgnmnt Spousal/Partner Support(Family Law)

4/15/2021: Order - Earnings Asgnmnt Spousal/Partner Support(Family Law)

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

3/9/2021: Minute Order

Dissomaster Printout

1/29/2021: Dissomaster Printout

Proof of Service - Mail

1/21/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Notice - Of Non-Receipt Of Respondent's Response To Petitioner's Request For Order RE: Child Custody, Visitation, Spousal Support, Child Support and Attorney's Fees And Costs Filed On October 1, 2020

1/26/2021: Notice - Of Non-Receipt Of Respondent's Response To Petitioner's Request For Order RE: Child Custody, Visitation, Spousal Support, Child Support and Attorney's Fees And Costs Filed On October 1, 2020

Minute Order

1/29/2021: Minute Order

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Change re: Attorney's Fees and Costs

10/1/2020: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Change re: Attorney's Fees and Costs

Notice - Case Assignment

9/15/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 22, Powell, Michael R., Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJoinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Air Conditioning & Refridgeration Industry Trust Fund ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJoinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan (Air Conditioning & Refridgeration Industry Trust Fund ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH