This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 06:41:42 (UTC).

PALACIOS, MARK D. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 PALACIOS, MARK D - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6012

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

VONGKESONE BRITTNY NICOLE

PALACIOS ARIEL BROOKE

Decedents

PALACIOS MARK

PALACIOS MARK D.

Other

RUIZ PALACIOS JENICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NEWTON CARSON CADET

 

Court Documents

Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

3/29/2021: Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

Supplement - Supplement to Petition

3/11/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition

Supplement - Supplement dissolution of marriage

3/22/2021: Supplement - Supplement dissolution of marriage

Supplement - Supplement - resident

3/2/2021: Supplement - Supplement - resident

Supplement - Supplement - predeceased

3/2/2021: Supplement - Supplement - predeceased

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

3/2/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - Supplement relationship

3/2/2021: Supplement - Supplement relationship

Supplement - Supplement adopted

3/2/2021: Supplement - Supplement adopted

Supplement - Supplement living apart

3/3/2021: Supplement - Supplement living apart

Supplement - Supplement reg domestic partner

3/3/2021: Supplement - Supplement reg domestic partner

Supplement - Supplement bond waiver

3/3/2021: Supplement - Supplement bond waiver

Supplement - Supplement unsecured creditors

3/3/2021: Supplement - Supplement unsecured creditors

Minute Order

12/16/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

12/14/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Notice of Non-Opposition

12/15/2020: Notice - Notice of Non-Opposition

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

7/28/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • Hearing04/16/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketObjection - Appointment of Personal Representative (Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative ); Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement dissolution of marriage ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement unsecured creditors ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement living apart ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement reg domestic partner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement bond waiver ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement - resident ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement - predeceased ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement adopted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Non-Opposition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWTON CARSON C.