Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2021 at 05:41:01 (UTC).

PALACIO, CHARLES FRANK VS PALACIO, AGBOMERE JUNE

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 PALACIO, CHARLES FRANK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PALACIO, AGBOMERE JUNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0213

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PALACIO CHARLES FRANK

Respondent

PALACIO AGBOMERE JUNE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail - Response (FL-120)

4/5/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Response (FL-120)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

4/5/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

4/6/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service of Summons

3/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/16/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

2/16/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons - Issued

2/16/2021: Summons - Issued

Notice - Case Assignment

2/16/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/16/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response (FL-120) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less