Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2021 at 03:55:07 (UTC).

PAKOZDI, DORIS VS BALTAZAR, SUSANA

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 PAKOZDI, DORIS filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against BALTAZAR, SUSANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT, CARLA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0516

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARRETT, CARLA L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAKOZDI DORIS

Respondent

BALTAZAR SUSANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

5/5/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

5/5/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/14/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/14/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/14/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/14/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Garrett, Carla L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (ADDENDUM )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.