This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 07:34:36 (UTC).

PAITSAR BAGHRAMOVA VS YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 PAITSAR BAGHRAMOVA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8208

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAGHRAMOVA PAITSAR

Defendant

YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARYAN KARAPET

Defendant Attorney

PANMAN ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/3/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Settlement

6/29/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2022

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/25/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)(WAIVED FEES DUE)

9/16/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)(WAIVED FEES DUE)

Request for Dismissal

10/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Paitsar Baghramova on 03/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Paitsar Baghramova as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff); As to: Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not entered)(WAIVED fees due); Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff); As to: Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff); As to: Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff); As to: Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff); As to: Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less