This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 21:04:43 (UTC).

PAITSAR BAGHRAMOVA VS YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 PAITSAR BAGHRAMOVA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8208

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAGHRAMOVA PAITSAR

Defendant

YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARYAN KARAPET

Defendant Attorney

PANMAN ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/3/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Settlement

6/29/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2022

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/25/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/29/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Young Mens Christian Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paitsar Baghramova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANMAN ROBERT H.