This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 04:04:39 (UTC).

PADGETT, DEBRA TAYLOR VS HARRIS, CORRINE OCTAVIA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 PADGETT, DEBRA TAYLOR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HARRIS, CORRINE OCTAVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0934

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PADGETT DEBRA TAYLOR

Respondent

HARRIS CORRINE OCTAVIA

 

Court Documents

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

10/22/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/22/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

10/22/2020: Minute Order

Order - (Transcript Ordered)

10/22/2020: Order - (Transcript Ordered)

Response - Domestic Violence

10/1/2020: Response - Domestic Violence

Proof of Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

9/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED AND PARTLY DENIED

9/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED AND PARTLY DENIED

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

9/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • Hearing11/25/2020 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder ((Transcript Ordered) )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (PARTLY GRANTED AND PARTLY DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less