This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 11:07:53 (UTC).

PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1649

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN

COGNEIN AN INDIVIDUAL AND REPRESENTATIVE EXECUTOR AND/OR HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN PERSIDE NICOLE AKA ESHRAT MASOODIFAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

10/13/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

10/13/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/25/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAddress for Daniel M Medioni (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: Perside Nicole Cognein, an individual and representative, executor and/or heir of THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: Perside Nicole Cognein, an individual and representative, executor and/or heir of THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Daniel M Medioni (Attorney): First Name changed from DANIEL to Daniel; Last Name changed from MEDIONI to Medioni; Organization Name: Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin; Middle Name: M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAddress for Daniel M Medioni (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Perside Nicole Cognein, an individual and representative, executor and/or heir of THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant): First Name changed from PERSIDE to Perside; Last Name changed from COGNEIN to Cognein, an individual and representative, executor and/or heir of THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN; Middle Name changed from NICOLE to Nicole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint: As To Parties changed from PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant), THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant) to THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant), PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant); Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant), THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant) to PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant), THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant); Status changed from Issued and Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 207

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PACIFICA TERRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: PERSIDE NICOLE COGNEIN (Defendant); THE ESTATE OF GUY COGNEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Helen Zukin in Department 207 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M