This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 04:27:12 (UTC).

PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC, ET AL. VS JOSEF GUTTMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEF GUTTMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2896

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION FUND LLC

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.

Defendants

GUTTMAN JOSEF

VILLA PARADISA LLC

SILICON BEACH CONSTRUCTION INC.

TIKVAH SHALVA

ARKO GROUP LLC

804 CALIFORNIA LLC

SPIKE CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GROSSBART KENNETH SAMUEL

GROSSBART KENNETH S.

Defendant Attorneys

COHEN BARRY L.

COHEN KERRY A.

COHEN BARRY LEE

COHEN KERRY A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;)

11/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;)

Proof of Personal Service

12/26/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANTS SPI...)

2/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANTS SPI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE REGARDING FINAL STATUS ...)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE REGARDING FINAL STATUS ...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

3/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - Notice of Ruling on Defendant 804 California LLC's Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens or Alternatively for an Undertaking as a Condition of Maintaining the Lis Pendens

2/1/2019: Notice - Notice of Ruling on Defendant 804 California LLC's Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens or Alternatively for an Undertaking as a Condition of Maintaining the Lis Pendens

Declaration - Declaration of mailing of notice of Lis Pendens

10/31/2018: Declaration - Declaration of mailing of notice of Lis Pendens

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Pacifica First National, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (OF MILENE C. APANIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION FUND, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANTS JOSEF GUTTMAN and SPIKE CONSTRUCTION, INC., and SILICON BEACH CON); Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Pacifica First National, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketMotion to Expunge Lis Pendens (or Alternatively for an Undertaking as a Condition of Maintaining the Lis Pendens); Filed by 804 California, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion of 804 California, LLC to Expunge Lis Pendens or Alternatively for an Undertaking as a Condition of Maintaining the Lis Pendens); Filed by 804 California, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Pacifica First National, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of mailing of notice of Lis Pendens); Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Pacifica First National, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pacifica Development & Construction Fund, LLC (Plaintiff); Pacifica First National, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIKE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARKO GROUP LLC is a litigant