This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 12:24:14 (UTC).

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK, A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK VS LISLE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 PACIFIC WESTERN BANK, A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LISLE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG D. KARLAN and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2007

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CRAIG D. KARLAN

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK

Defendants

BLACK GARRETT

COLE STEVE

ENNSMANN MARK

LISLE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

MAJAUSKA DAIVA

MOSS PAM

NAPER PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION DBA LISLE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

PELETIS JOSEPH

PILLAI VELLAPAN

SAPALAITE INGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHENEY BRENT

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISED STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE, DISMISSAL, AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES, AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

2/14/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISED STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE, DISMISSAL, AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES, AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE,...) OF 02/01/2023

2/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE,...) OF 02/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE,...)

2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE,...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/26/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/18/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Revised Stipulation for Order of Discharge, Dismissal, Award of Costs and Attorney Fees, And Distribution of Funds; [Proposed] Order Thereon; Filed by: Pacific Western Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Ruling on Stipulation for Order of Discharge,...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Ruling on Stipulation for Order of Discharge,...) of 02/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 01/26/2023 to 01/26/2023 ; As To Parties: Pam Moss (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 01/26/2023 to 01/26/2023 ; As To Parties: Garrett Black (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 01/26/2023 to 01/26/2023 ; As To Parties: Steve Cole (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 04/25/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department N to Department 200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Pacific Western Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Pacific Western Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: Pacific Western Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lisle Place Condominium Association, an Illinois corporation (Defendant); Naper Place Condominium Association dba Lisle Place Condominium Association (Defendant); Joseph Peletis (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pacific Western Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lisle Place Condominium Association, an Illinois corporation (Defendant); Naper Place Condominium Association dba Lisle Place Condominium Association (Defendant); Joseph Peletis (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pacific Western Bank, a California state-chartered bank (Plaintiff); As to: Lisle Place Condominium Association, an Illinois corporation (Defendant); Naper Place Condominium Association dba Lisle Place Condominium Association (Defendant); Joseph Peletis (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less