This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2019 at 07:47:32 (UTC).

PACIFIC VIEW COLLECTIONS, LLC VS YANA SLETTEN

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 PACIFIC VIEW COLLECTIONS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against YANA SLETTEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0117

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC VIEW COLLECTIONS LLC

Defendant

SLETTEN YANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FELDMAN JASON KENNETH

STASER JOHN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/12/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

9/12/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

Judgment

9/12/2019: Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/26/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney

6/24/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/13/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order Re: Confession of Judgment); Filed by Pacific View Collections, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Pacific View Collections, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacific View Collections, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STASER JOHN CHRISTOPHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN JASON K.