This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:25:33 (UTC).

PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS KAISER ROOFING

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAISER ROOFING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1612

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KAISER ROOFING

Cross Defendants

TALBOT ANITA

TALBOT ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SELLER JANICE M.

SELLER JANICE MATLIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WARD JOHN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

1/7/2021: Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND A STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND A STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 5-13 CLOSED))

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 5-13 CLOSED))

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROOF OF SERVICE

4/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/21/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Request for Dismissal

4/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

3/9/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/9/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49; Trial Setting Conference (AND a Status Conference) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference AND a Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketStatus Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT); Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 49; Case Management Conference ((c/f 5-13 CLOSED)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference (c/f 5-13 CLOSED))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kaiser Roofing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kaiser Roofing (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Kaiser Roofing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Kaiser Roofing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Kaiser Roofing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELLER JANICE M.