This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 04:11:54 (UTC).

PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS GEORGE ADAMIAN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEORGE ADAMIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ADAMIAN GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P.

Defendant Attorney

WILSON JOHN D.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTI...) OF 09/13/2021

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTI...) OF 09/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTI...)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTI...)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/30/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

7/30/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/26/2021

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Cross-Complaint

6/28/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/05/2021

5/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/05/2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/19/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (By Joint Stipulation To Continue Final Status Conference and Trial Dates, Filed by Defendant George Adamian) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application By Joint Stipulation To Conti...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application By Joint Stipulation To Conti...) of 09/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (BY JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by GEORGE ADAMIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint (of George Adamian For Damages Base Upon: 1. Constructed Eviction 2. Fraud in Inducement and 3. Breach of Conract); Filed by GEORGE ADAMIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 05/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.