Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:51:32 (UTC).

PACIFIC EUROTEX CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SEXY DIVA CLOSET, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 PACIFIC EUROTEX CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEXY DIVA CLOSET, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3068

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACIFIC EUROTEX CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PACIFIC EUROTEX CORP.

Defendants

YAZDIAN DIVA MOJGAN

SAGHIAN BAHMAN

SEXY DIVA CLOSET INC. AKA VICCI VICCI A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAFVATI DAVID M.

SAFVATI DAVID M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

5/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

Statement of the Case

5/7/2021: Statement of the Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

5/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / JUDGMENT REJECTED

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID M. SAFVATI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID M. SAFVATI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID M. SAFVATI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID M. SAFVATI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Statement of the Case

5/7/2021: Statement of the Case

Statement of the Case

5/7/2021: Statement of the Case

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID M. SAFVATI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID M. SAFVATI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT;)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT;)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

3/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Of David M. Safvati In Support Of Application For Default Judgment); Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Of David M. Safvati In Support Of Application For Default Judgment); Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pacific Eurotex Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC EUROTEX CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SEXY DIVA CLOSET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA SEXY DIVA is a litigant