This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 21:30:07 (UTC).

PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC. VS DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0298

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES INC.

Defendants

DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES LLC

FINANCE CALIFORNIA

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

IVY PORTFOLIO LLC

LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY

AXOS BANK

PLATINUM TRIANGLE TECHNOLOGY GROUP LLC

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

SHAMOOIL MASOOD

PRLAP INC.

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

KHADAVI ALEX A.

AGATA LIMITED LLC

PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY

STALGI INC.

BERNARDI ALDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKOWITZ STEVEN

ETEHAD SIMON P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

6/14/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/14/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

9/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Plaintiff); Filed by Pacific Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Alex A. Khadavi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Alex A. Khadavi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacific Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pacific Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pacific Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DULCE VIDA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FINANCE CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES is a litigant