This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 10:26:25 (UTC).

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SUPER HK, HG LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUPER HK, HG LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5933

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO. INC.

Defendants

SUPER HK HG LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUPER HK OF EL MONTE

SUPER HK HG LLC

SUPER HK OF EL MONTE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY PARK LTD . A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRINCE DAVID L.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/5/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

11/20/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

10/8/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

8/25/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

8/26/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

7/8/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

5/15/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/5/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

5/11/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/11/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Summary of the Case

5/11/2020: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/28/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/4/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment (by Court After Default); Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER HK HG LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA BOTH HONG KONG SUPERMARKET AND HONG KONG MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. is a litigant