Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 02:41:18 (UTC).

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LVS SEAFOOD CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LVS SEAFOOD CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2650

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LVS SEAFOOD CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK EVAN A.

PRINCE DAVID L.

 

Court Documents

Status Report - STATUS REPORT CASE STATUS REPORT FOR COURT HEARING

1/6/2021: Status Report - STATUS REPORT CASE STATUS REPORT FOR COURT HEARING

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

1/7/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/3/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/3/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case

12/3/2020: Summary of the Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Ruling

8/4/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/1/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: (service; AND a Trial Setting Conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment by Court After Default); Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketStatus Report (CASE STATUS REPORT FOR COURT HEARING); Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pacific American Fish Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC AMERICAN FISH COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK EVAN ALEXANDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS