Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 01:10:38 (UTC).

PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP.,. A WASHINGTON CORP. VS MANINDER SINGH

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP , A WASHINGTON CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANINDER SINGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THERESA M. TRABER and BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0363

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THERESA M. TRABER

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP. . A WASHINGTON CORP.

Defendant

SINGH MANINDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLICAR RAY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

5/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

6/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

7/6/2020: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Default/Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Default/Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Default/Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Default/Default Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:53 PM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Application for Issuance of a Writ of Possession after Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.,. a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACCAR FINANCIAL CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR RAY