Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 12:36:32 (UTC).

PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP., A WASHINGTON CORP. VS GURPREET SINGH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP , A WASHINGTON CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GURPREET SINGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0753

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACCAR FINANCIAL CORP. A WASHINGTON CORP.

Defendants

SINGH GURPREET

ALLIANCE TRUCKING INC. A CALIF. CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLICAR RAY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

5/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

3/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/5/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/6/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE TRUCKING LP is a litigant

Latest cases where PACCAR FINANCIAL CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR RAY