This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 02:12:41 (UTC).

PABLO RIVERO VS GENERAL STAR NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 PABLO RIVERO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL STAR NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0630

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERO PABLO

Defendant

GENERAL STAR NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMER STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/6/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/29/2021

Substitution of Attorney

5/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • Hearing10/19/2021 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 06/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Pablo Rivero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pablo Rivero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pablo Rivero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pablo Rivero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL STAR NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMER STEVEN