This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:48:19 (UTC).

PABLO RIVAS GUTIERREZ VS JUAN HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ III ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 PABLO RIVAS GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JUAN HERNANDEZ GONZALEZ III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4385

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ PABLO RIVAS

Defendants

MOJARRO ROCIO

GONZALEZ JUAN HERNANDEZ III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARRACHE HECTOR ANTONIO ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/17/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

3/17/2017: SUMMONS

Answer

5/17/2019: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/4/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing

4/2/2019: Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/11/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order

1/14/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/14/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

12/14/2018: Answer

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration

10/25/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

8/21/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Juan Hernandez III Gonzalez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Juan Hernandez III Gonzalez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tr...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pablo Rivas Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Rocio Mojarro (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of summons); Filed by Pablo Rivas Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Pablo Rivas Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non Service); Filed by Pablo Rivas Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pablo Rivas Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4385    Hearing Date: December 10, 2020    Dept: 29

Pablo Rivas Gutierrez v. HernandezThe unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Pablo Rivas Gutierrez, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362. The order is effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the motion on the Plaintiff. Until then, counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: ****4385    Hearing Date: July 10, 2020    Dept: 29

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The motion does not include proof that the motion was served on all parties, including the Plaintiff. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(d).

Plaintiff’s counsel filed a supplemental declaration showing that Plaintiff did not receive the motion. Where the address of the client is not known, “any attempt of service pursuant to this subdivision may be made by delivering the notice or papers to the clerk of the court, for that party. Cal Code Civ Procedure ; 1011(b)(3).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

AN APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED, AS A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS ALSO SCHEDULED FOR THIS DATE.



Case Number: ****4385    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 29

Gutierrez v. Gonzalez et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR for defective notice. The motion should have been filed and served by 1/30/20 to allow for 16 court days of notice increased by five calendar days for service by mail. Counsel served the motion on 2/5/20.

The Moving Party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARRACHE HECTOR