This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 19:59:42 (UTC).

PABLO OLIVERA, BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, ERLINDA OLIVERA VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 PABLO OLIVERA, BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, ERLINDA OLIVERA filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9769

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVERA BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST ERLINDA OLIVERA PABLO

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

BRESSLER ERIK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL /BY PABLO OLIVERA...)

11/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL /BY PABLO OLIVERA...)

Notice of Ruling

11/12/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/12/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/12/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES PABLO OLIVERA

9/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES PABLO OLIVERA

Case Management Order

9/29/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL

9/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIK M. BRESSLER IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIAL

9/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIK M. BRESSLER IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC AND REQUES

9/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC AND REQUES

Opposition - OPPOSITION NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC AND REQUEST FO

9/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC AND REQUEST FO

Case Management Statement

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Separate Statement

8/30/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ACTUAL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

8/30/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ACTUAL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THE DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/18/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/18/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/18/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (/By Pablo Olivera (Plaintiff)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel /By Pablo Olivera...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 11:22 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) of 06/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ERLINDA OLIVERA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST); Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pablo Olivera, by and through his successor in interest, Erlinda Olivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL