This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 01:51:55 (UTC).

PABLO FRAGOSO ET AL VS UNIVERSAL AWNING INC

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 PABLO FRAGOSO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against UNIVERSAL AWNING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1150

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FRAGOSO PABLO

ALMAZO PABLO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

UNIVERSAL AWNING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JOSEPHSON JACK D. ESQ.

JOSEPHSON JACK DAVID ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SHOMLOO FARSHEED ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

8/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

Notice of Ruling

1/15/2020: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FARSHEED SHOMLOO RE OSC RE SANCTION

1/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FARSHEED SHOMLOO RE OSC RE SANCTION

Notice of Ruling

12/4/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/2/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ...)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER PROVE-UP)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER PROVE-UP)

Notice of Ruling

7/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

5/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Exhibit List

3/20/2019: Exhibit List

Exhibit List

3/20/2019: Exhibit List

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

1/25/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

1/25/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL AWNING, INC.

5/8/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL AWNING, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/21/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 02/26/20) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...) of 08/12/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 02/26/20) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 02/26/20) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Universal Awning Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Pablo Fragoso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pablo Fragoso (Plaintiff); Pablo Almazo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: 1. FAILURE TO PAY WAGES (LABOR CODE 201-202, 218, 218.5, 1194, 1194.2];ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691150    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 19

The Motions to Be Relieved as Counsel are DENIED without prejudice.

At the hearing on October 10, 2019, the Court found that counsel had not filed proofs of service.  The Court continued the hearing to today's date, and ordered counsel to file the Proofs of Service for the Motions by October 15, 2019, showing that the clients had been served with notice of the motion. The Court finds that no Proofs of Service were filed with counsel’s Motions as required.  Instead, on October 17, 2019, two days late, Counsel re-filed the Motions to be Relieved as Counsel for hearing on October 27, 2019, and included Proofs of Service that were dated October 11, 2019. The Court does not accept the proofs of service as dated, and cannot find that Plaintiffs Pablo Almozo and Pablo Fragoso were properly served with adequate notice of the Motions to be Relieved as Counsel. (See Code Civ. Proc. § 284(2); Code Civ. Proc. § 1005(b).)

Accordingly, the Motions to be Relieved as Counsel are DENIED without prejudice.

Counsel for Plaintiffs to give notice.