This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:56:57 (UTC).

PABLO ANTONIO RAMIREZ VS JULIO CESAR AGUILAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 PABLO ANTONIO RAMIREZ filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JULIO CESAR AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2230

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ PABLO ANTONIO

Defendants

AGUILAR JULIO CESAR

GIMIS ENTEPRISE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MAXRES INC. DBA CENTURY 21 ALLSTARS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES AYINDE A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • Hearing03/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PABLO ANTONIO RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PABLO ANTONIO RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PABLO ANTONIO RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAXRES INC. DBA CENTURY 21 ALL STARS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES AYINDE A