This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 00:35:18 (UTC).

OZHENI MUSHEGYAN, ET AL. VS CLINT WILLIAM HEIDORN

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 OZHENI MUSHEGYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLINT WILLIAM HEIDORN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9446

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUSHEGYAN OZHENI

CHEFIKIAN BENNOUN

Defendant

HEIDORN CLINT WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAHAMIAN DAVID VAHE

Defendant Attorneys

NETTELS CHARLES F.

NETTELS CHARLES F

MCDONALD AMELIA BARBARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ozheni Mushegyan (Plaintiff); Bennoun Chefikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Clint William Heidorn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Clint William Heidorn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ozheni Mushegyan (Plaintiff); Bennoun Chefikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Clint William Heidorn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Clint William Heidorn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Clint William Heidorn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ozheni Mushegyan (Plaintiff); Bennoun Chefikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ozheni Mushegyan (Plaintiff); Bennoun Chefikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDONALD AMELIA BARBARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NETTELS CHARLES F. ESQ.