This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 17:04:29 (UTC).

OXBRIDGE COINS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MICHAEL JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 OXBRIDGE COINS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1974

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OXBRIDGE COINS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

JOHNSON MICHAEL DBA MIDWEST COIN COMPANY

JOHNSON PATRICK DBA DOLLARS & CENTS

WESTFORD RARE COINS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by OXBRIDGE COINS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by OXBRIDGE COINS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by OXBRIDGE COINS, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A