Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 01:45:04 (UTC).

OVSANNA YEPREMYAN VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2018 OVSANNA YEPREMYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1557

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

ANTONYAN ARUSYAK

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOES 1 TO 25

Minor

YEPREMYAN OVSANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

KRISSMAN JAROD A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ARCHER NORRIS

NORRIS ARCHER

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

2/10/2021: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

10/30/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

10/30/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF IAN C. DEADY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

9/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF IAN C. DEADY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION (MINOR)

8/19/2020: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION (MINOR)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES INCLUDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

12/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES INCLUDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

12/19/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

12/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/31/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

9/13/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/20/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/13/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/13/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/28/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing of Proof of Deposit into Blocked Account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Arusyak Antonyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Arusyak Antonyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Arusyak Antonyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 10/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Arusyak Antonyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF IAN C. DEADY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR?S COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION); Filed by Arusyak Antonyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Ovsanna Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketAPPLICAT1ON AND ORDER FOR APPOINTTIENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIV1L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691557    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

OSVANNA YEPREMYAN,

Plaintiff,

vs.

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT,

Defendant.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

) ) ) )

.: BC691557

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Dept. 27

10:30 a.m.

September 3, 2020

Claimant Ovsanna Yepremyan (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Arusyak Antonyan (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant Los Angeles Unified School District. in exchange for $125,000.00.  If approved, $8,580.99 will be used for medical expenses, $31,250.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $4,160.17 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $81,008.84 for Claimant, to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim.  (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.)  The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable.  Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable. that the medical providers identified in Item 13b5 have agreed to a negotiated reduction in charges

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is DENIED without prejudice.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the September 3, 2020 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  Petitioner and Claimant’s appearances are excused. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 3rd day of September 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISSMAN JAROD ADAM