This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 10:51:28 (UTC).

OVERLAND DIRECT, INC. VS YANIV TEPPER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 OVERLAND DIRECT, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against YANIV TEPPER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5743

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVERLAND DIRECT INC.

Defendants

PAYAN FIROOZ

KASHEFI SAEED

TEPPER DANIEL

ESOLA CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

TEPPER YANIV

U.S. NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A CORP.

DOES 1 TO 50

TRANSPINE INC.

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

SECURITY UNION CORPORATION

VANOWEN 2 LLC

U.S. BANCORP INC.

WOOSHIES INC.

COHEN AVSHY

U.S. BANCORP INC

TARZANA HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RIKOS GEORGE D.

SHEM-TOV SHALEM

WILLIAMS ALAN KEITH

RIKOS GEORGE D

Defendant Attorneys

BROWNSTEIN WILLIAM HAROLD

TAITELMAN MICHAEL ANDREW

HAMILTON JOHN MICHAEL

BROWN AARON SCOTT

MCCLENDON REGINA JILL

GOULDING DANIEL JOSEPH

STANTON DAVID LONGJOHN

KELLEY PAUL MICHAEL

ABRAMS ALAN K

 

Court Documents

Reply

6/11/2019: Reply

Legacy Document

8/4/2017: Legacy Document

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/7/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/7/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/7/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Minute Order

9/29/2017: Minute Order

Answer

12/11/2017: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/13/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection

12/13/2017: Notice of Rejection

Legacy Document

1/9/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

2/13/2018: Legacy Document

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/16/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/16/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

5/25/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

10/30/2018: Case Management Statement

Association of Attorney

11/14/2018: Association of Attorney

Notice

4/24/2019: Notice

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Transpine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Reply (RE DEFENDANT TRANSPINE, INC.?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPOSITION OF TRANSPINE, INC.); Filed by Transpine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Shorten time for Defendant Transpine, Inc's Motion for Protective Order) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten time for Defendant...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W; (Application-Ex Parte; Granted-In part) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice-Lodging; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Overland Direct Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC105743    Hearing Date: August 10, 2020    Dept: W

OVERLAND DIRECT, INC. V. YANIV TEPPER, ET AL.

plaintiff’s motion to compel deposition and motion to compel further responses

Date of Hearing: August 10, 2020 Trial Date: None set.

Department: W Case No.: LC105743

BACKGROUND

On December 19, 2016, Plaintiff Overland Direct, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) obtained a judgment against Daniel Tepper, Esola Capital, LLC, and Avshy Cohen. The Judgment quieted title to a property not subject to the instant action and awarded Plaintiff $100,000 in punitive damages.

Prior to the entry of judgment, however, Plaintiff alleges a series of fraudulent transfers involving the judgment debtors and title on 4256 Tarzana Estates Drive, Tarzana (the “Property”). Plaintiff further alleges that U.S. Bank held a secured interest in the property through a loan to Defendant Yaniv Tepper.

On May 30, 2017, Overland Direct, Inc. filed a Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Violation of the Voidable Transfer Act. The Declaratory Relief claim alleges that Defendant Tepper lacks any legal interest in the Tarzana Property. The Violation of the Voidable Trust Act claim alleges that the transfers of title were part of a scheme to avoid liability on the Overland Direct judgment.

On July 11, 2017, the Court denied the application to enjoin any sale of the property, including a foreclosure sale on the property by U.S. Bank, but granted the application enjoining any disbursement of funds. The foreclosure sale was scheduled for August 24, 2017.

On May 17, 2019, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint designating Defendant Wooshies, Inc. (“Defendant”) as Doe 1. Default was entered against Defendant on July 11, 2019. On August 13, 2019, the courted granted the parties’ stipulation to vacate and set aside the default and to allow Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint. After sustaining Defendant’s demurrer to the SAC, Plaintiff filed a Third Amended Complaint (“TAC”) on November 5, 2019.

On February 19, 2020, this court sustained Defendant’s demurrer to the first (declaratory relief) and third (cancellation of a written instrument) causes of action of the TAC without leave to amend.

Plaintiff moves to compel the deposition of Defendant Daniel Tepper aka Danny Tepper aka Dan Tepper (“Tepper”) to comply and appear for his duly noticed deposition. Plaintiff further moves to compel further discovery responses from Nisan Tepper.

[Tentative] Ruling

1. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Defendant Daniel Tepper aka Danny Tepper aka Dan Tepper to Appear for Deposition is GRANTED.

2. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel a Further Response and Production to Request for Production of Documents, Set One from Nisan Tepper, individually and as Trustee of the Tepper Family Revocable Trust is GRANTED.

DISCUSSION

1. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Defendant Daniel Tepper aka Danny Tepper aka Dan Tepper to Appear for Deposition

Plaintiff moves this court for an order compelling Defendant Daniel Tepper aka Danny Tepper aka Dan Tepper (“Daniel Tepper”) to comply with, and appear for his depositions in accordance with, the valid and duly noticed depositions.

On January 15, 2020, Overland’s counsel served upon Daniel Tepper and all parties a deposition notice and request for production of documents for Daniel Tepper’s deposition on February 10, 2020. (Mobasser Decl., ¶4; Exh. 2.) One business day prior to the duly noticed deposition, Daniel Tepper informed Plaintiff’s counsel that he would not appear for the deposition on February 10, 2020. (Mobasser Decl., ¶5; Exh. 3.) Because Daniel Tepper did not provide Plaintiff’s counsel with an alternative date or stipulate to appear at a future deposition, Plaintiff informed Daniel Tepper they would move forward with the February 10, 2020 deposition. (Mobasser Decl., ¶5; Exh. 3.) Daniel Tepper did not appear and Plaintiff had to take a certificate of non-appearance. (Mobasser Decl., ¶6; Exh. 4.)

On February 13, 2020, Daniel Tepper informed Plaintiff’s counsel that he agreed to appear for his deposition on March 5, 2020. (Mobasser Decl., ¶7; Exh. 5.) That same day, Plaintiff’s counsel served Daniel Tepper and all parties an Amended Notice of Deposition and Request for Production of Documents for March 5, 2020. (Mobasser Decl., ¶8; Exh. 6.) Again, one business day prior to the set deposition, Daniel Tepper informed Plaintiff he would not be appearing because he could not get in touch with his limited scope attorney, Robert Smith. Plaintiff informed Daniel Tepper his non-appearance would result in court intervention. (Mobasser Decl., ¶9; Exh. 7.) Daniel Tepper failed to appear on March 5, 2020 and Plaintiff had to take a certificate of non-appearance. (Mobasser Decl., ¶9; Exh. 7 and McCarthy Decl. ¶3; Exh. 1.)

Given Daniel Tepper’s failure to appear for his deposition after two properly served deposition notices, as well as Plaintiff’s good-faith attempts to resolve the matter, Plaintiff’s Motion is GRANTED. Daniel Tepper is ordered to appear for deposition and produce documents specified in the deposition notice within twenty (20) days of the hearing of this Motion. The court will discuss with counsel whether any special accommodations need to be made in light of the current pandemic.

Sanctions

It has been established that if a motion to compel deposition is granted, the court shall impose a monetary sanction in favor of the party who noticed the deposition and against the deponent or the party with whom the deponent is affiliated, unless the court finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust. (CCP §2025.450(g)(1).)

Plaintiff requests this court impose sanctions on Daniel Tepper as a direct result of Daniel Tepper’s willful failure to appear for two duly noticed depositions in the amount of $14,391.70. Counsel for Plaintiff contends this amount includes the 16.40 hours preparing for Daniel Tepper’s deposition, 2.50 hour traveling to and from the deposition on February 10, 2020, 3.50 hours meeting and conferring and preparing this motion and supporting declarations, and 4.00 hours in anticipation of any opposition, reply, and appearance at the hearing on this motion at this rate of $500.00 as well as $840.70 for the court reporter affidavit of non-appearance on February 10, 2020, $411.00 for the court reporter affidavit of non-appearance on March 5, 2020, and the $60 filing fee.

Although the court finds that sanctions are warranted under CCP §2025.450(g)(1), Plaintiff’s request is excessive, however. As such, the court finds that $5811.70 is a reasonable sum for 3.5 hours spent in preparing the instant Motion and conducting the meet and confer, 2.5 hours travelling to the depositions, 2 hours for preparing for the deposition (as much of the work would necessarily have to be done for the deposition now ordered by the court) and one (1) hour for attendance at the hearing at a rate of $500.00 per hour plus $60.00 in filing fees, and $840.70 plus $411 for the two affidavits of non-appearance.

Plaintiff also requests this court impose the $500 sanction pursuant to CCP §1992, which provides “A person failing to appear pursuant to a subpoena or a court order also forfeits to the party aggrieved the sum of five hundred dollars ($500), and all damages that he or she may sustain by the failure of the person to appear pursuant to the subpoena or court order, which forfeiture and damages may be recovered in a civil action.” This court grants the $500 forfeiture authorized by CCP §1992.

2. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel a Further Response and Production to Request for Production of Documents, Set One from Nisan Tepper, individually and as Trustee of the Tepper Family Revocable Trust

Plaintiff moves this court for an order compelling Defendant Nisan Tepper, individually and as trustee of the Tepper Family Revocable Trust, to provide a further response and produce documents in response to Plaintiff’s Requests for Production of Documents, Set One (specifically, Request for Production No. 4) propounded to Nisan Tepper individually and as trustee, respectively.

Under Code of Civil Procedure section 2031.310(a), on receipt of a response to a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling, the demanding party may move for an order compelling further response to the demand if the demanding party deems that any of the following apply: (1) A statement of compliance with the demand is incomplete; (2) A representation of inability to comply is inadequate, incomplete, or evasive; or (3) An objection in the response is without merit or too general.

A motion to compel further responses must set forth specific facts showing “good cause” justifying the discovery sought by the demand and must be accompanied by a declaration showing a “reasonable and good faith attempt” to resolve the issues outside of court. (CCP §§2016.040, 2031.310(b)(2).) The motion must also be accompanied by a separate statement.  (CRC 3.1345(a)(3).) In addition, unless the parties have agreed otherwise in writing, a motion to compel further responses must be served within 45 days after service of a verified response.  (CCP §2031.310(c).) Otherwise, the demanding party waives any right to compel a further response to the demand. (Id.)   

The court notes Plaintiff has complied with the meet and confer and separate statement requirements. (See Whitemore Decl. ¶¶6-7.)

Request for Production No. 4 provides: “Any and all DOCUMENTS which evidence any interests YOU have in any revocable or irrevocable trust between 2000 and Present.” Nisan objected to the request on six grounds, and stated “No documents will be produced[.]” Nisan Tepper’s objections include (1) vague and ambiguous with respect to the term interests YOU have in any revocable or irrevocable trust; (2) overbroad, unduly burdensome and oppressive; (3) seeking information violative of the responding parties right of privacy; (4) seeking information violative of the taxpayer privilege; (5) seeking information violative of Civil Code §3295(c); and, (6) seeking the discovery of information that is neither relevant nor calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence.

The court finds that Plaintiff has met its burden of showing good cause. Specifically, Plaintiff contends the trust documents are relevant as it will help determine whether Defendant Nisan Tepper and/or the Trust played a role (i.e., participated) in the fraudulent/voidable transfers that are alleged in Plaintiff’s operative TAC. Defendant Transpine has produced bank statements by the Trust, including cancelled checks, many of which were made payable to Defendant Daniel Tepper. Moreover, Plaintiff provides the deposition of Yaniv Tepper, who has testified that he and Daniel Tepper are beneficiaries of the Trust. Checks have also been produced that were made payable to Defendant Saeed Kashefi from the Trust. As such, the court finds the requested documents tend to show the relationships between Nisan, the Trust, Transpine, and the subject property. In Reply, Plaintiff also notes the documents are relevant to Plaintiff’s alter ego allegations.

For the purposes of discovery, information will be deemed relevant as long as “‘might reasonably assist a party in evaluating the case, preparing for trial, or facilitating settlement….’ [Citation.]”  (Gonzalez v. Superior Court (1995) 33 Cal.App.4th 1539, 1546, italics in quoted text.)  The “subject matter” of a pending action also encompasses far more matters than the actual issues at trial, and is not limited by admissibility in any way.  (Jessen v. Hartford Cas. Ins. Co. (2003) 111 Cal.App.4th 698, 711.)  Moreover, because the rules of discovery are “applied liberally in favor of discovery…,” even the so-called “fishing expedition” will be permissible under certain circumstances.  (Gonzalezsupra, 33 Cal.App.4th at p. 1546, citations omitted.) 

In opposition, Nisan Tepper argues Plaintiff has failed to show good cause and privacy rights are implicated. As discussed above, the court finds Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause for the trust documents. As for the privacy objections, the court finds any privacy interests may be protected by entry of a protective order.

When privacy interests are implicated, discovery will not be permitted simply because it could lead to other relevant evidence. (See Board of Trustees v. Superior Court (1981) 119 Cal.App.3d 516, 525.)  Rather, discovery of sensitive information will only be allowed where it is both directly relevant to a cause of action and essential to a fair resolution of the matter.  (Britt v. Superior Court (1978) 20 Cal.3d 844, 859.)  To that end, the party seeking discovery has the “burden of making a threshold showing that the evidence sought is ‘directly relevant’ to the claim or defense.” (See Harris v. Superior Court (1992) 3 Cal.App.4th 661, 665.)  Also, discovery will not be compelled if the information sought is available from alternative sources or through less-intrusive means.  (Allen v. Superior Court (1984) 151 Cal.App.3d 447, 449.) 

Defendant Nisan relies on In Estate of Gallio (1995) 33 Cal.App.4th 592 to support his contention that discovery into the Trust would be a gross intrusion into his privacy interests. However, the court finds Gallio distinguishable from the issues here. The court had denied discovery because the step-children had failed to make threshold showing that joint will was made, that decedent and stepmother agreed to hold property as community property, or that stepmother was aware of terms of decedent's will. Here, Plaintiff is not seeking the private documents of a third party, but seeks the documents of a party. The Trust was named a party in December 2019. Moreover, Plaintiff has made a threshold showing that the Trust made payments to Defendant Daniel Tepper, that he is a beneficiary of the trust, and support Plaintiff’s alter-ego allegations. As such, the court finds Plaintiff has made a threshold showing that the evidence is directly relevant and that plaintiff has a compelling need for such documents.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel a Further Response and Production to Request for Production of Documents, Set One from Nisan Tepper, individually and as Trustee of the Tepper Family Revocable Trust