This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 01:48:30 (UTC).

OTTO GONZALEZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 11/09/2017 OTTO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2702

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GONZALAEZ OTTO

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/9/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/9/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/13/2017: ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

4/25/2019: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates]); Filed by LOS ANGELES, CITY OF (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by OTTO GONZALAEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2702    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 29

Gonzalez v. City of Los Angeles

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Otto Gonzalez, is GRANTED.

Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. The order shall be effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the signed order on the client. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(e).  Counsel shall remain counsel of record until the proof of service of the signed order is filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.