This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 13:59:33 (UTC).

OSVALDO ROMAN VS SAMIR BARUDI

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 OSVALDO ROMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAMIR BARUDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0068

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ROMAN OSVALDO

LOUCKS GARY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

BARUDI SAMIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS TAYLOR FINDLEY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

FERRANTE JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

8/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

5/27/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/27/2021: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

4/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SCHEDULING)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SCHEDULING)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SCHEDULING) OF 04/12/2021

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SCHEDULING) OF 04/12/2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Completion of Service of Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Completio...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Samir Barudi (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference and Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Samir Barudi (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Samir Barudi (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross Complaint); Filed by Osvaldo Roman (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Osvaldo Roman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of 04/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Osvaldo Roman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Osvaldo Roman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Osvaldo Roman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Osvaldo Roman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, TAYLOR F