Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 09:44:09 (UTC).

OSVALDO MARTINEZ VS HARVEST PACK, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 OSVALDO MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HARVEST PACK, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0545

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ OSVALDO

Defendant

HARVEST PACK INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

PRINCE DAVID LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/1/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

2/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/19/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/16/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Osvaldo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Harvest Pack, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Osvaldo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Osvaldo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Osvaldo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Osvaldo Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS