Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2021 at 09:11:43 (UTC).

OSORIO MARTINEZ, VIOLETA VS FONSECA PALOMERA, JOSE JUAN

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 OSORIO MARTINEZ, VIOLETA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FONSECA PALOMERA, JOSE JUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0211

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OSORIO MARTINEZ VIOLETA

Respondent

FONSECA PALOMERA JOSE JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WHITE GRACE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

3/12/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

3/12/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - by fax

2/16/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - by fax

Summons - Issued

2/16/2021: Summons - Issued

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/16/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) - by fax

2/16/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111) - by fax

Notice - Case Assignment - by fax

2/16/2021: Notice - Case Assignment - by fax

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111) (by fax )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment (by fax )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (by fax ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less