This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:29:49 (UTC).

OSIEL DE LEON VS LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 a Labor - Wrongful Termination case was filed by OSIEL DE LEON against LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8945

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DE LEON OSIEL

Defendants and Respondents

LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES LLC

ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

DOES 1 TO 100

PAIZ JOSE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/7/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/4/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/18/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/9/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANT LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC DBA ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

4/11/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANT LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC DBA ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANT JOSE PAIZ

4/11/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANT JOSE PAIZ

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE SECTION 52.1; 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC.

2/23/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE SECTION 52.1; 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC.

PLAINTIFF OSIEL DE LEONS'S NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND OMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC DBA ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

2/23/2018: PLAINTIFF OSIEL DE LEONS'S NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND OMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC DBA ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/9/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/14/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/14/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/14/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/12/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

1/3/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 52.1 ;ETC

1/3/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 52.1 ;ETC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 38; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANT LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC DBA ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANT JOSE PAIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 38; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • PLAINTIFF OSIEL DE LEONS'S NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT JOSE PAIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE SECTION 52.1; 2. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • PLAINTIFF OSIEL DE LEONS'S NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND OMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC DBA ROYAL AIRLINE LINEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Osiel De Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 52.1 ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

N. Nick Ebrahimian, Esq. (State Bar No. 219270) FILED nebrahimian@]lelawfirm.com | OSgtfvcgu{t OfACalif'omla Joshua M. Webster, Esq. (State Bar No. 298546) Of Los Angeles

iwebster@lelawfirm.com LAVI &%BRAHIMI’AN, LLP FEB 2 3 2018

8889 W. Olympic Blvd. Suite 200 Sherri R, -y Beverly.Hills, California 90211 B > uve OfficenClerk

| Telephone: (310).432-0000 = - Deputy Facsimile: (310) 432-0001 en

Attorneys for Plaintiff | |

OSIEL DE LEON | BY FAX SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ~ CENTRAL DISTRICT

~ NOTICE OF FILING PROQF OF - SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT JOSE

LAX IN-FLITE SERVICES, LLC dba ROYAL PAIZ

AIRLINE LINEN; JOSE PAIZ; and DOES 1 to 100, inclusive,

DEFENDANTS.

TO THE HONORABLE COURT,; ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF | RECORD: |

Plaintiff OSIEL DE LEON hereby submits the Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on. Defendant JOSE PAIZ A true and. correct copy of the Proof of Service of Summons and Ct)"mplai'nt‘ is attached hereto as Exhibit 1.

Dated: February 23, 2018 Respectfully submitted, .

' | " LAVI&E [TMIAX

7 N Niek Ebrahimian, Es§,

_. / Joshua Webster, Esq.

/.~ Attorneys for PLAINTIFF

OSIEL DE LEON