This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2022 at 11:42:16 (UTC).

OSCAR TEJADA VS ANTHONY GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 OSCAR TEJADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0198

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEJADA OSCAR

Defendant

GUTIERREZ ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN JESSE L

Defendant Attorney

SHAVER THOMAS WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/23/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/23/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/15/2022: Answer

Notice of Related Case

10/31/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 11/02/2022

11/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 11/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

11/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2025
  • Hearing03/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • Hearing09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Filed by: Anthony Gutierrez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 11/02/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV11528, 22STCV10198, 22STCV11275 are related; case number 22STCV10198 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV10198, 22STCV11275, 22STCV11528 are related; case number 22STCV10198 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV10198, 22STCV11528, 22STCV11275 are related; case number 22STCV10198 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Oscar Tejada (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Gutierrez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Oscar Tejada (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Gutierrez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Oscar Tejada (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Gutierrez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERN JESSE L.