This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 11:49:08 (UTC).

OSCAR ORTIZ ET AL VS CHESTERTON CHIRSTMAS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 OSCAR ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHESTERTON CHIRSTMAS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8247

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ORTIZ OSCAR

MIRANDA MIRIAM

Defendants and Respondents

CONTRERAS FARAHEL VALENCIA

CHESTERTON CHRISTMAS LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

Not Classified By Court

PAULA GRISELDA ZAMORA LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CHAHINE HUSSEIN A. ESQ.

CHAHINE HUSSEIN ALI ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NORTHRUP SCHLUETER

SCHLUETER NORTHRUP

NORTHRUP LINDA L.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Separate Statement

3/3/2020: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

3/3/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

3/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

3/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

2/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE EXPERT TRIAL WITNESS INFORMATION

2/3/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE EXPERT TRIAL WITNESS INFORMATION

Notice of Related Case

9/4/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/6/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION OF ERIC H. GODOY AND CHAHINE LAW, APC TO BE...)

3/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION OF ERIC H. GODOY AND CHAHINE LAW, APC TO BE...)

Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF MIRIAM MIRANDA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIO

3/1/2019: Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF MIRIAM MIRANDA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIO

Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF MIRIAM MIRANDA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AND AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORAN

3/1/2019: Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF MIRIAM MIRANDA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AND AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORAN

Declaration - Declaration of Danielle N. Bray ISO MTC Fur Resps of Plf to Form Rog Set One

2/1/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Danielle N. Bray ISO MTC Fur Resps of Plf to Form Rog Set One

Separate Statement

2/1/2019: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

2/1/2019: Separate Statement

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • Hearing03/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Hearing03/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Request for Form Interrogatories, Set One) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Request for Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Request for Production of Documents) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Request for Production of Documents) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Request for Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Request for Form Interrogatories, Set One) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement (in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Plaintiff, Miriam Miranda's Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set One)); Filed by Chesterton Christmas LLC (Defendant); Harhelo Valencia Contreras Erroneously Sued As Farahel Valencia Contreras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Chesterton Christmas LLC (Defendant); Harhelo Valencia Contreras Erroneously Sued As Farahel Valencia Contreras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CHESTERTON CHRISTMAS, LLC AND HARHELO VALENCIA CONTRERAS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Oscar Ortiz (Plaintiff); Miriam Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698247    Hearing Date: July 09, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows. No opposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On March 13, 2018, Plaintiffs Oscar Ortiz and Miriam Miranda filed a complaint against Defendants Chesterton Christmas LLC and Farahel Valencia Contreras for motor vehicle and general negligence arising from an accident that occurred on April 24, 2017.

On September 10, 2019, the Court found this action related with BC722910.

On November 1, 2019, pursuant to the parties’ stipulation, the Court ordered this action to be consolidated with related action BC722910.

On March 5, 2020, Plaintiff Paula Griselda Zamora Lopez’s counsel, Eric H. Godoy and Chahine Law, APC filed the instant motion to be relieved as counsel.  No opposition has been filed.

On March 18, 2020, pursuant to the Administrative Order of the Presiding Judge regarding the COVID-19 pandemic, the Court, on its own motion, advanced and continued the hearing to April 29, 2020.

On April 15, 2020, the Court, again on its own motion, advanced and continued the hearing to July 9, 2020.

A trial setting conference is scheduled for August 24, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff’s counsel, Eric H. Godoy and Chahine Law, APC, seek a court order relieving them as counsel for Plaintiff Paula Griselda Zamora Lopez in this matter.

LEGAL STANDARD

California Rule of Court rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorneys Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

Counsel has submitted forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 in seeking to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Paula Griselda Zamora Lopez.

Counsel declares that there has been a complete breakdown in the attorney-client relationship.

Counsel has served the moving papers by mail at Plaintiff Lopez’s last known address, which has been confirmed within the past 30 days by conversation.  Counsel has also served the moving papers on defendants.

The Court finds that while counsel has generally complied with CRC Rule 3.1362, there are no indications that counsel has served notice of the continuance of this hearing.  

Therefore, the motion is CONTINUED to August 10, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 28 of Spring Street Courthouse located at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012.

Counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.