This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2020 at 20:08:29 (UTC).

OSCAR ORELLA VS SALVARDOR MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 OSCAR ORELLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALVARDOR MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7945

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORELLA OSCAR

Defendants

MORALES SALVARDOR

R&F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS JANETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

PI General Order

5/19/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AN HEARING DATES

5/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AN HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Oscar Orella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures an Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Oscar Orella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Oscar Orella (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS JANETH