This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 10:34:39 (UTC).

OSCAR OCHOA VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 OSCAR OCHOA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9710

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA OSCAR

Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE PANORAMA CITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN

Defendant Attorneys

SCHWAN BRADLEY ETHAN

KRANZ JANNINE E

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT OF PARTIES

4/26/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT OF PARTIES

Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RULING

1/17/2023: Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RULING

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

1/9/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

12/28/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Ruling

12/23/2022: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 12/12/2022

12/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 12/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

11/21/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

11/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/8/2022: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT - JOINT

11/8/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT - JOINT

Initial Status Conference Order

9/13/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/20/2022

9/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/20/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Report of Parties; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less