*******9710
09/12/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Other Labor
Los Angeles, California
ELIHU M. BERLE
WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER
OCHOA OSCAR
DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC
DEANCO HEALTHCARE PANORAMA CITY LLC
GILL JASMIN
KRANZ JANNINE E
SCHWAN BRADLEY ETHAN
1/17/2023: Notice of Ruling - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RULING
1/9/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
12/28/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT
12/23/2022: Notice of Ruling
12/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 12/12/2022
12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
11/21/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)
11/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
11/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
11/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
11/8/2022: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
11/8/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT - JOINT
9/13/2022: Initial Status Conference Order
9/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/20/2022
9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
9/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER
9/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service
Hearing05/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketPlaintiffs Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 01/04/2023; Result Type to Held
[-] Read LessDocketJoint Status Conference Report Class Action Response Statement; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Oscar Ochoa (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare Panorama City, LLC (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type
[-] Read Less