This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2019 at 10:17:28 (UTC).

OSCAR MOLINA ET AL VS MEDARDO ANTONIO SORTO ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 OSCAR MOLINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MEDARDO ANTONIO SORTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6054

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

MOLINA OSCAR

RAMIREZ SILVIA MARGARITA

Defendants and Respondents

ROSS BINDERY INC.

SUPPOSE U DRIVE INC.

SORTO MEDARDO ANTONIO

SUPPOSE U-DRIVE TRUCK RENTAL SERVICE INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Minors

MOLINA-RAMIREZ NATHAN

MOLINA-RAMIREZ CELESTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

YAGOUBZADEH LAW FIRM LLP

KHEHRA SUNNY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DE SPELDER ROBERT B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/21/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/6/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order

2/21/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/24/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

8/24/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/26/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/30/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE 2, NEGLIGENCE PER SE, AND 3. STATUTORY LIABILITY; ETC

3/30/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE 2, NEGLIGENCE PER SE, AND 3. STATUTORY LIABILITY; ETC

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/30/2017: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?C1VIL EX PARTE

5/4/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?C1VIL EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

5/4/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Oscar Molina (Plaintiff); Silvia Margarita Ramirez (Plaintiff); Celeste Molina-Ramirez (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Oscar Molina (Plaintiff); Silvia Margarita Ramirez (Plaintiff); Celeste Molina-Ramirez (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Sunny Khehra (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM C1VIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE 2, NEGLIGENCE PER SE, AND 3. STATUTORY LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Oscar Molina (Plaintiff); Silvia Margarita Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ross Bindery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPPOSE U DRIVE TRUCK RENTAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPPOSE U DRIVE INC. is a litigant