Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2021 at 13:24:21 (UTC).

OSCAR IXCHOP VS WILLIAM SENTELLE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 OSCAR IXCHOP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIAM SENTELLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1313

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IXCHOP OSCAR

Defendants

HD SUPPLY INC.

SENTELLE WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURLINGTON ALAN S.

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY BRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

12/2/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice of Ruling

12/2/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

12/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

11/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Ruling

11/4/2020: Notice of Ruling

Answer

10/1/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

7/7/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/10/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by WILLIAM SENTELLE (Defendant); HD Supply Facilities Maintenance, LP Erroneously Sued As HD SUPPLY INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by HD Supply Facilities Maintenance, LP Erroneously Sued As HD SUPPLY INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by WILLIAM SENTELLE (Defendant); HD Supply Facilities Maintenance, LP Erroneously Sued As HD SUPPLY INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WILLIAM SENTELLE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by OSCAR IXCHOP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HD Supply Facilities Maintenance, LP Erroneously Sued As HD SUPPLY INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by OSCAR IXCHOP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by OSCAR IXCHOP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by OSCAR IXCHOP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by OSCAR IXCHOP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HD Supply Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY BRIAN P.