This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 22:30:19 (UTC).

OSCAR DIAZ GOMEZ VS WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 OSCAR DIAZ GOMEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9254

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ OSCAR DIAZ

Defendants

DODO MICHAEL

WEST CENTRAL FOOD LLC

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOON KENNETH H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 12/21/2022

12/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 12/21/2022

Initial Status Conference Order

12/21/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

12/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Initial Status Conference Report

2/24/2023: Initial Status Conference Report

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/1/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Continuance - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/1/2023: Notice of Continuance - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONTINUED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Continued Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Oscar Diaz Gomez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/09/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Response Statement: Exact Name: Plaintiff's Initial Status Conference Response Statement ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Report; Filed by: Oscar Diaz Gomez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Oscar Diaz Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: West Central Produce, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Oscar Diaz Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: West Central Food, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carolyn B. Kuhl in Department 12 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kenneth H. Yoon (Attorney): Middle Name: H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Oscar Diaz Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: West Central Produce, Inc. (Defendant); West Central Food, LLC (Defendant); Michael Dodo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Oscar Diaz Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: West Central Produce, Inc. (Defendant); West Central Food, LLC (Defendant); Michael Dodo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less