This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 12:16:03 (UTC).

OSCAR CID DEL PRADO VS SALON CHEVAL LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 OSCAR CID DEL PRADO filed a Labor - Workplace Harassment lawsuit against SALON CHEVAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2889

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CID DEL PRADO OSCAR

Respondents

GALLUZZO ELISE CHVAL

SALON CHEVAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOULARTE DANIEL

Respondent Attorney

RUMM JAMES

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

2/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

2/16/2022: Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS

Answer

1/21/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/14/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

9/24/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 09/24/2021

9/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 09/24/2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/1/2021: Petition - PETITION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Conference Post Resolve Law LA MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Orders); Filed by Oscar Cid Del Prado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Salon Cheval LLC (Respondent); Elise Chval Galluzzo (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Salon Cheval LLC (Respondent); Elise Chval Galluzzo (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Salon Cheval LLC (Respondent); Elise Chval Galluzzo (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 09/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Oscar Cid Del Prado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Oscar Cid Del Prado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Oscar Cid Del Prado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPetition (Complaint for Damages); Filed by Oscar Cid Del Prado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUMM JAMES