This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 03:35:39 (UTC).

OSCAR ANDRADE, ET AL. VS VIRIDI CONSTRUCTION, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 OSCAR ANDRADE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIRIDI CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0507

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REFUGIO GUILLEN LLAMAS MA DEL

ANDRADE OSCAR

Defendants

NO SURNAMES GIVEN JAVIER

VIRIDI CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANZO FRANK A

Defendant Attorney

CADE NATHANAEL P

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES) OF 09/16/2021

9/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES) OF 09/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED DOES)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

3/12/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/16/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

2/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 01/11/2021

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 01/11/2021

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

10/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Hearing04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) of 09/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Viridi Construction, Inc (Defendant); Javier Suarez Erroneously Sued As Javier No Surnames Given (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions, in the amount of $250, against counsel for plaintiff for failure to appear on 1/11/2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...) of 01/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Oscar Andrade (Plaintiff); Ma Del Refugio Guillen Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Oscar Andrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Oscar Andrade (Plaintiff); Ma Del Refugio Guillen Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Oscar Andrade (Plaintiff); Ma Del Refugio Guillen Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Oscar Andrade (Plaintiff); Ma Del Refugio Guillen Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANZO FRANK A