This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 04:10:32 (UTC).

OSCAR ALEJANDRO PANO RIVERA VS BRUCE CLAYBURN HOOD

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 OSCAR ALEJANDRO PANO RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRUCE CLAYBURN HOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4758

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PANO RIVERA OSCAR ALEJANDRO

Defendant

HOOD BRUCE CLAYBURN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE TERRY J

DORDICK GARY A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/31/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/31/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/31/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/2/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2024
  • Hearing10/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2024
  • Hearing04/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oscar Alejandro Pano Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Clayburn Hood (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/01/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Oscar Alejandro Pano Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Clayburn Hood (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Oscar Alejandro Pano Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Clayburn Hood (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Oscar Alejandro Pano Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Clayburn Hood (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Oscar Alejandro Pano Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Clayburn Hood (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less