This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 02:47:51 (UTC).

OSBORNE, CARY VS MASON, CLAIRE

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 OSBORNE, CARY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MASON, CLAIRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4538

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OSBORNE CARY

Respondent

MASON CLAIRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MARTIN DAMON E

MARTIN DAMON EVERETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (FILED AND ENTERED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (REJECT ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (REJECT #2 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (aamended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F39, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (REJECT #1 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Osborne, Cary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Osborne, Cary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Osborne, Cary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Osborne, Cary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.